THE FRIENDS OF WHITCHURCH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (SHROPSHIRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Object of the Association is to relieve patients and former patients of the Whitchurch Hospital and other invalids in the Community who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped, infirm or in need of financial assistance and, generally, to support the charitable work of the said Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Shropshire
Governance
- 25 February 1991: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF WHITCHURCH HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE WHITCHURCH HOSPITAL(SHROPSHIRE) (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF WHITCHURCH HOSPITAL(SHROPSHIRE) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ROGER LLOYD DONE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Linda Weston | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
susan campbell | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Ellwood | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Joan Arthan | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
JUDITH CLAYTON MBE | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Margaret Harding | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
PATRICIA ANN SHONE | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ROSEMARY MARGARET POWELL | Trustee | 18 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
KATHLEEN MCCLELLAN | Trustee | 11 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
DEBORAH JANE GLENNIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR DONALD PEARCE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MRS PAULINE STOKES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
EINWEN KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.75k | £107.63k | £42.13k | £28.89k | £275.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.78k | £169.43k | £9.79k | £7.95k | £149.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK,CONVALESCENT,DISABLED,HANDICAPPED,INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NORTH SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lower House Farm
Terrick
WHITCHURCH
Shropshire
SY13 4JZ
- Phone:
- 01948 664593
- Email:
- Pauline.elsley@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window