THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF DENTAL AND MAXILLOFACIAL RADIOLOGY

Charity number: 1002045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. The advancement of the education of the public by the promotion of the study of Dental and Maxillofacial Radiology. 2. To promote the study of radiographic technique. 3. To encourage and support high standards of undergraduate and postgraduate education in Dental and Maxillofacial Radiology. 4. To provide advice on issues involving Dental and Maxillofacial Radiology.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £33,664
Total expenditure: £49,745

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 March 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BSDMFR (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Rose Ngu Chair 19 October 2019
None on record
Neil Henderson Trustee 19 October 2019
None on record
Bhagyalakshmi Batchu Trustee 19 October 2019
None on record
Dr Suk Yee Ng Trustee 19 October 2019
None on record
Paul Philip Nixon Trustee 19 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £48.36k £22.51k £12.17k £36.55k £33.66k
Total expenditure £23.09k £16.12k £14.14k £35.21k £49.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BSDMFR (at HGE Ltd)
Hay Green Corner
Fishlake
Doncaster
Yorkshire
DN7 5LA
Phone:
01302 578 839