Financial history MOUNT ZION PENTECOSTAL APOSTOLIC CHURCH BIBLE COLLEGE

Charity number: 1002049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.03k £10.68k £12.13k £20.39k £18.17k
Total expenditure £15.93k £15.78k £11.48k £19.76k £18.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A