GUNTHORPE VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Village Hall and Playing Field provided for the benefit of the parishioners of Gunthorpe, Nottingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,505 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 26 February 1991: Standard registration
- GUNTHORPE VICTORY HALL (Working name)
- GUNTHORPE VICTORY HALL AND PLAYING FIELD FUND (Working name)
- GUNTHORPE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- VICTORY HALL & PLAYING FIELD FUND (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam babiarz | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony luckett | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
philippa milbourne | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley jeffery | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra mills | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
sarah ward | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael spencer | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT SEVERN | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul William Jeffery | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.93k | £29.93k | £32.41k | £26.46k | £26.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.17k | £5.85k | £52.87k | £17.88k | £40.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.54k | £13.29k | £2.75k | £4.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MAY 1948
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GUNTHORPE AND ITS VICINITY.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF GUNTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Fearon Close
Gunthorpe
NOTTINGHAM
NG14 7FA
- Phone:
- 01159664301
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window