Financial history NIGHTSAFE LIMITED

Charity number: 1002057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.13m £964.43k £900.96k £1.11m £1.34m
Total expenditure £1.03m £856.07k £1.00m £1.08m £1.34m
Income from government contracts £187.00k £163.20k £193.75k £193.75k £200.59k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £546.55k £245.80k £156.63k £229.21k £149.44k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £581.11k £718.30k £744.30k £876.83k £1.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £329 £37 £575 £2.06k
Income - Other £630 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £10.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £834.18k £989.26k £1.07m £1.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.11k £21.89k £12.31k £12.28k £4.54k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £17.90k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0