Financial history BUCKDEN TOWNSHIP HALL

Charity number: 1002078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.17k £10.87k £1.50k £7.29k £8.51k
Total expenditure £45.77k £7.75k £3.30k £6.45k £6.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A