Trustees BUCKDEN TOWNSHIP HALL

Charity number: 1002078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Vetch Chair 20 May 2016
None on record
Susan Booth Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Catherine Lois Pickering Trustee 27 April 2021
None on record
Robert Everett Trustee 16 June 2020
None on record
Douglas McLellan Trustee 24 May 2019
None on record
Barbara Ramsden Trustee 24 May 2019
None on record
Julian Rangeley Trustee 07 July 2016
None on record
Linda Portman Trustee 07 July 2016
None on record
Deborah Ruth Roe Trustee 20 May 2016
None on record
Elizabeth Margaret Dawson Trustee 20 May 2016
None on record
Sandra Ann Kilvington Trustee 20 May 2016
None on record
Gillian Owen Trustee 20 May 2016
None on record