MOULTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"... physical & mental training & recreation & social, moral & intellectual development through the medium of a Village Hall to be used for the purposes of a reading & recreation room library lectures classes recreations & entertainments or otherwise as may be found expedient for the benefit of the inhabitants of the parish of Moulton & its immediate vicinity without distinction of sex or of pol..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £3,073 from 3 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 05 March 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Marshall | Chair | 20 September 2010 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Michael Harrington | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Philip Kirkman | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Richard Joseph Kevork Edge | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Christopher Childs | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Linda Spinks | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Susan Wakes-Miller | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ryan Bragg | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Clarke | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
Alexis Nichols | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jeremy Goodwin | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
Gillian Goodwin | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dorothy Bowes | Trustee | 20 September 2010 |
|
|
||||||||||
Yvonne Slater | Trustee | 20 September 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.60k | £25.72k | £22.24k | £28.48k | £31.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.20k | £21.07k | £16.78k | £26.78k | £32.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £16.57k | £2.67k | £2.60k | £3.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 21ST. FEBRUARY 1955 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF 8 JUNE 2006 AND RESOLUTION DATED 5 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF A VILLAGE HALL TO BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A READING AND RECREATION ROOM, LIBRARY LECTURES CALSSES RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MOULTON IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MOULTON, SUFFOLK AND THE IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moulton Village Hall
Bridge Street
Moulton
NEWMARKET
CB8 8SP
- Phone:
- 01638 551851
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window