THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH, PLUCKLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUND RAISING FOR THE FABRIC OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH PLUCKLEY: OPEN GARDENS, HARVEST SUPPER
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 05 March 1991: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Ashby | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Robinson | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
terence webb | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
mary willetts | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH FRIES | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Wyndham | Trustee | 20 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAN CAMPAILLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILL HIGHWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.16k | £3.25k | £3.48k | £4.78k | £7.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £472 | £0 | £0 | £723 | £1.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 AUGUST 1990 AS AMENDED 11 JANUARY 1991
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND SUPPORT THE VICAR, CHURCHWARDENS AND PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL OF PLUCKLEY TO: (A) MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RENEW, ENHANCE AND EXTEND THE STRUCTURE AND FABRIC, FURNISHINGS AND FITTINGS (INCLUDING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE DESCRIPTION "FITTINGS" ANY ORGAN OR OTHER MUSICAL INSTRUMENT OR MEANS OF MUSIC PRODUCTION WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE WITHIN THE CHURCH AND USED EXCLUSIVELY IN CONNECTION THEREWITH) OF THE SAID ST NICHOLAS CHURCH, PLUCKLEY. (B) KEEP IN GOOD ORDER AND CONDITION AND TO BEAUTIFY THE CHURCHYARD AND BOUNDARY WALLS OF THE SAID CHURCH.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PLUCKLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill House
Pluckley
Ashford
TN27 0PD
- Phone:
- 01233840340
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window