Trustees WALLINGTON COUNTY GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1002095

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sunil Kumar | Chair | 14 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Mohammad Manirul Islam CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Srinivas Maddimsetty | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashish Kumar Gupta | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Fernie | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dhanushka Tennakoon Mudiyanselage | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vinai Haria | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Bean | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mahmuda Chowdhury | Trustee | 14 November 2003 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.