The Norfolk Diabetes Trust t/a Diabetes Norfolk

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's primary purpose is to support the care of patients with diabetes residing in Norfolk. This includes providing additional facilities not available on the NHS and supporting educational initiatives designed to improve patients' and carers' knowledge of the condition and their ability to improve control.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 05 March 1991: Standard registration
- DIABETES NORFOLK (Previous name)
- THE NORFOLK DIABETES TRUST (Previous name)
- THE NORWICH AND NORFOLK DIABETES TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR MICHAEL JOHN SAMPSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fenella Littleboy | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clair Haylock | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katharina Mattishent | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr KETAN KUMAR DHATARIYA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET FLATMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.31k | £32.33k | £10.83k | £12.48k | £14.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.81k | £0 | £55.05k | £29.27k | £76.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 DECEMBER 1990 AS VARIED BY DEED DATED 3 SEPTEMBER 1998 AS VARIED BY DEED DATED 3 FEBRUARY 2004 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 4 JANUARY 2011. as amended on 17 Dec 2021 as amended on 17 Dec 2021 as amended on 28 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
(1)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION. (2)FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE BRITISH ISLES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BANKSIDE 300
PEACHMAN WAY
BROADLAND BUSINESS PARK
NORWICH
NORFOLK
NR7 0LB
- Phone:
- 07534740055
- Website:
-
diabetesnorfolk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window