Accounts and annual returns LITTLE OTTERS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1002116
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 March 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 09 March 2017 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 09 March 2017 129 days late
Annual return 31 December 2014 27 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 27 October 2015 On Time