LITTLE OTTERS PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LEARNING THROUGH PLAY WITH ACTIVITIES PLANNED IN LINE WITH THE EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION STAGE FOR CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 3 AND 5
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 07 March 1991: Standard registration
- 20 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to be charitable)
- LITTLE OTTERS PRE-SCHOOL AND TODDLER GROUP (Working name)
- EAST BUDLEIGH PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- LITTLE OTTERS PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.17k | £49.23k | £37.80k | £39.22k | £40.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.26k | £55.28k | £38.18k | £37.90k | £44.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 09 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 09 March 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 09 March 2017 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 09 March 2017 | 129 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 27 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 27 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH. SEPTEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY (A)PROVIDING SAFE & SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART (B)ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN.(C)FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE EAST BUDLEIGH, OTTERTON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window