Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE HEANOR HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1002188
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/11/2014 21/11/2015 21/11/2016 21/11/2017 21/11/2018
Total gross income £61.23k £5.87k £677 £436 £1.12k
Total expenditure £2.67k £5.44k £498 £476 £1.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A