ANIMAL SHELTER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animal Shelter
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 March 1991: Standard registration
- 07 July 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Paying staff
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.44k | £94.30k | £122.53k | £146.29k | £42.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.13k | £129.21k | £238.17k | £147.30k | £155.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2022 | 221 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2022 | 586 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15/01/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/10/2014
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE CARE AND PROTECTION FOR CATS AND DOGS WHICH HAVE BEEN ABANDONED, NEGLECTED, MALTREATED OR WHICH ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED OF SUCH CARE AND PROTECTION; (2) TO FIND SUITABLE HOMES FOR CATS AND DOGS IN NEED BY REASON OF BEING ABANDONED, STRAY OR OTHERWISE HOMELESS; (3) TO ASSIST OWNERS OF CATS AND DOGS RESIDENT WITHIN GREAT BRITAIN TO MEET VETERINARY FEES WHERE THE OWNERS WOULD HAVE OTHERWISE BEEN UNABLE TO MEET SUCH FEES; (4) TO PREVENT THE UNWANTED BREEDING OF CATS AND DOGS; (5) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE NEEDS AND PROPER CARE OF CATS AND DOGS AND ANIMALS GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window