Trustees BIRMINGHAM CHRISTIAN COLLEGE
Charity number: 1002205

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Daniel Ato Eduah | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Gyamfi Agyeman | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Abraham Arthur | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adjoa Adoma-Kumi | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eric Appiah-Yeboah | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ivy Ifeatu Essiam | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Eric Kwabena Nyamekye | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Doe Kugbeadjor | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kwaku Junior Frempong-Boadu | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Emmanuel Agyemang Bekoe | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Francis Owusu Kwaah | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Winifred Agyemang | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELDER KWAKU JOE ADOMAKO | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lord Elorm-Donkor | Trustee | 17 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kwabena Agyapong-Kodua | Trustee | 17 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.