Accounts and annual returns CARRE'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1002210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 11 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 11 April 2025 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 11 April 2025 621 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 11 April 2025 986 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 April 2025 1354 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required