THE FRIENDS OF THE LONDON HOSPITAL (ST CLEMENT'S)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Friends shall be to relieve patients and former patients of St. Clements Hospital, now the Mental Health Unit at Mile End Hospital, and other persons in the community who suffer from mental illness or the effects of mental illness and generally to support the charitable work of said hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 12 March 1991: Standard registration
- 18 March 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 18 March 2015: Funds transferred to 1051845 PATHWAYS TRUST
- FRIENDS OF ST CLEMENTS HOSPITAL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.56k | £19.42k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.51k | £20.45k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 02 April 2014 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 16 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 27 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH MAY 1987 AND ANENDED 5TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE LONDON HOSPITAL (ST. CLEMENT'S) AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO SUFFER FROM MENTAL ILLNESS OR THE EFFECTS OF MENTAL ILLNESS AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
TOWER HAMLETS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window