OUR LADY OF FIDELITY GENERAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of financial support to the Order of Our Lady of Fidelity's religious communities at Upper Norwood, Folkestone and India. The development of a new Apostolate at Folkestone consisting of a chapel for the local community, day care for 2 to 5s and individually guided retreats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Croydon
- France
- India
Governance
- 13 March 1991: Standard registration
- 29 June 2012: Funds received from 250262 COMMUNITY OF OUR LADY OF FIDELITY
- OUR LADY OF FIDELITY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister Sister Bernadette BA HONS MA | Chair |
|
||||||
Olufemi Olugbenga Oresanya | Trustee | 18 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Sr Meena Raphel Arakkal Sr | Trustee | 18 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOY ALAPPAT | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sister Sandra Davey BA Hons | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.27k | £122.01k | £118.61k | £96.38k | £187.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £626.83k | £345.82k | £245.24k | £137.02k | £160.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06/02/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 26/06/2013
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON PROMOTED OR SUPPORTED BY THE VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION OF ROMAN CATHOLIC WOMEN KNOWN AS THE COMMUNITY OF OUR LADY OF FIDELITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Convent of Our Lady of Fidelity
1 Our Lady's Close
Upper Norwood
London
SE19 3FA
- Phone:
- 020 8761 4420
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window