THE RETIREMENT TRUST
Charity number: 1002223
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of pre-retirement advice through seminars and talks given to other organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout London
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 March 1991: Standard registration
- 15 September 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 September 2020: Funds transferred to 1133482 CONCERN AND HELP FOR EAST ELMBRIDGE RETIRED (CHEER...
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 12 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE APPROACHING RETIREMENT OR HAVE ALREADY RETIRED FROM EMPLOYMENT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window