Accounts and annual returns SOCIETY FOR COMPUTING AND TECHNOLOGY IN ANAESTHESIA

Charity number: 1002231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 08 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 08 August 2024 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 12 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required