THE ROSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Generally the Charity funds/sponsors people undertaking charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 March 1991: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 08 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALICE ELGIVA ROBERTSON | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN ARKWRIGHT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £53.83k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £710 | £798 | £810 | £410 | £410 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD. SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HATTON HOUSE
HATTON
WARWICK
CV35 7LD
- Phone:
- 01926843411
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window