ROMANIAN ORPHANS APPEAL CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Romania
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 March 1991: Standard registration
- 13 September 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.60k | £6.11k | £6.06k | £3.84k | £6.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.74k | £10.22k | £5.15k | £5.47k | £5.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 16 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 04 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 31 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 MARCH 1991 ALTERED BY SCHEME DATED 16 APRIL 1998.
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF PERSONS FROM ROMANIA WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY REASON OF THEIR HANDICAP, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AND SUPPLIES (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS FROM ROMANIA AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL SUPPLIES ADN SPONSORING EDUCATIONAL COURSES FOR THEM IN THE UK.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window