Accounts and annual returns THE TOLER FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1002268

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 August 2024 | 550 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 August 2024 | 915 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 August 2024 | 1280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window