PREMA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prema exists to allow the community to interface with quality arts activities through a programme of creative opportunities and cultural expression.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 March 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily May Barker | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alun Edmunds | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Corina Louise Coombs | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Rosalind Price | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janette Wallace | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Atlanta Haley Paraskeva | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Ann-Hannah Paraskeva | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
LAURA NICHOLAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SIMON OPHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN HILLIARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.99k | £130.78k | £156.07k | £178.73k | £147.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.91k | £102.81k | £148.75k | £169.85k | £156.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £30.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH. MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF ADUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGING OF THE ARTS AND CRAFTS AND THE PROMOTION OF THOSE ACTIVITIES WHICH MAKE THEM RELEVANT TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Prema Arts Centre
South Street
Uley
Dursley
GL11 5SS
- Phone:
- 01453860703
- Email:
- info@prema.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window