Trustees PREMA
Charity number: 1002269

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily May Barker | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alun Edmunds | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Corina Louise Coombs | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Rosalind Price | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janette Wallace | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Atlanta Haley Paraskeva | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Ann-Hannah Paraskeva | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
LAURA NICHOLAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SIMON OPHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN HILLIARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.