FRIENDS OF BULGARIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Bulgaria provides humanitarian aid to Bulgaria focusing on improving the quality of life of disadvantaged children and young people through fund-raising raising initiatives and events. Financial grants are awarded by the Committee to Bulgarian NGOs and institutions on the basis of project proposals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bulgaria
Governance
- 22 March 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BRISBY KC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Momchil Konstantinov | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dessislava Ivanova | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
RALITZA PETROVA | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Sabina Ivanova Zlateva | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ATANAS CHRISTEV | Trustee | 30 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN POPOV | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr claire brisby | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr GEORGE KIROV | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.59k | £3.58k | £9.52k | £19.78k | £18.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.27k | £9.75k | £15.33k | £18.88k | £18.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN BULGARIA AND FOR THE BULGARIAN PEOPLE,THE PROMOTION OF BULGARIAN CULTURE,ARTS,CRAFTS,LITERATURE,DRAMA AND MUSIC,THE RELIEF OF POVERTY,SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG THE PEOPLE OF BULGARIA AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHCARE IN BULGARIA AND ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE IMPROVEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF HOSPITALS,CLINICS AND OTHER MEDICAL FACILITIES THEREIN
Area of benefit
BULGARIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 THURLOE SQUARE
LONDON
SW7 2SX
- Phone:
- 0207 584 6605
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window