Financial history VICTORIA ROAD SCHOOL PARENTS GROUP

Charity Number: 1002337
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009
Total gross income £2.50k £700 £0 £311 £1.32k
Total expenditure £2.50k £0 £0 £1.80k £383
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A