SIR JOHN HICKS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting study and research in the Discipline of Economics and awarding prizes and scholarships in Economics from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY STYLIANOS COURAKIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROGER PAUL BOOTLE | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.04k | £11.13k | £9.69k | £13.25k | £12.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.30k | £8.30k | £8.80k | £2.93k | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF VARIATION DATED 23RD APRIL 1990
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING (A)PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE DISCIPLINE OF ECONOMICS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH (B)ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A PRIZE AND SCHOLARSHIPS TO BE FROM TIME TO TIME AWARDED IN THE MANNER SPECIFIED IN CLAUSE 2 OF THIS SCHEDULE (1)THERE SHALL BE A PRIZE TO BE KNOWN AS "THE HICKS PRIZE" OF A YEARLY VALUE TO BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES. THE PRIZE SHALL BE AWARDED PERIODICALLY FOR MAJOR CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE DISCIPLINE OF ECONOMICS AND SHALL BE LINKED WITH A VISITING FELLOWSHIP AT BRASENOSE COLLEGE, OXFORD OR SOME OTHER COLLEGE OR ACADEMIC INSTITUTION (11)THERE SHALL BE SCHOLARSHIPS TO BE KNOWN AS "THE HICKS SCHOLARSHIPS" WHICH SHALL BE AWARDED ON MERIT FOR STUDY AND RESEARCH IN THE DISCIPLINE OF ECONOMICS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRASENOSE COLLEGE
RADCLIFFE SQUARE
OXFORD
OX1 4AJ
- Phone:
- 01865762207
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window