JAMES MOORES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising the artistic taste of the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 April 1991: Standard registration
- NIGEL MOORES FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Moores | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL KURTHAUSEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES CECIL SCOTT MOORES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.01k | £0 | £10.04k | £185 | £124 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £360 | £10.89k | £360 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 JANUARY 1991 AS AMENDED ON 26 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BWMACFARLANE
CASTLE CHAMBERS
43 CASTLE STREET
LIVERPOOL
L2 9SH
- Phone:
- 01512361494
- Email:
- mail@bwm.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window