PENTECOSTAL RESIDENCES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provider of housing for over 60's
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £185,464 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Halton
Governance
- 27 March 1991: Standard registration
- FAIR HAVENS COURT (Working name)
- Foundry Community Housing (Working name)
- PRC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEAN JOHN SMITH | Chair | 11 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Howard John Carruthers Kelly | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Lois Martha Taviner | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Lynn Holland | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE HICKLING | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.72k | £334.92k | £336.00k | £344.85k | £363.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.99k | £211.24k | £297.68k | £316.41k | £379.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £117.21k | N/A | £183.51k | N/A | £185.46k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16TH OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
1) HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS OVER 60 YEARS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ACCOMMODATION AND WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE HALTON PENTECOSTAL CHURCH OR IN FELLOWSHIP WITH THE CHURCH, OR A CHURCH IN FELLOWSHIP THEREWITH , OR OTHER PERSONS IN SUCH NEED. 2) RELIEVING AGED PERSONS IN OCCUPATION OF THE HOUSING ACCOMMODATION OF THE CHARITY AND,SUBJECT THERETO , APPLYING THE INCOME IN FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HALTON PENTECOSTAL CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Foundry
65 Lugsdale Road
Widnes
WA8 6DA
- Phone:
- 0151 420 8837
- Email:
- office@thefoundry.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window