Financial history THE MAYFIELD TRUST

Charity Number: 1002398
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.58m £2.73m £3.31m £3.87m £4.61m
Total expenditure £2.34m £2.44m £2.84m £3.73m £4.48m
Income from government contracts £1.72m £1.48m £1.90m £2.28m £0
Income from government grants £747.80k £1.08m £1.11m £1.05m £0
Income - Donations and legacies £389 £883 £84 £1.54k £2.66k
Income - Other trading activities £1.63k £1.64k £1.96k £9.49k £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.57m £2.71m £3.30m £3.85m £4.60m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.72k £10.51k £10.61k £8.76k £13.65k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.34m £2.44m £2.84m £3.72m £4.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £226 £96 £902 £2.63k £0
Expenditure - Governance £46.74k £10.62k £12.93k £16.18k £15.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0