Trustees THE BRYAN FOSTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1002413

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROBIN HUGH BROWN | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER SADLER | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE ELIZABETH VAN BEVEREN | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MARY WILLIS | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES HOWELL | Trustee | 02 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN PETER EMERSON | Trustee | 18 February 1991 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.