Financial history LONGWICK VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1002419
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.17k £22.52k £11.70k £34.21k £25.97k
Total expenditure £25.47k £18.68k £17.72k £27.11k £24.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.57k N/A £6.90k N/A