THE SPEECH, LANGUAGE AND HEARING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity receives income from rent which is solely used to make grants to charities and organisations that provide support, therapy and education to children who are hearing impaired, autistic and communication delayed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 1991: Standard registration
- 09 February 2016: Funds received from 327605 THE F H MUIRHEAD CHARITABLE TRUST
- CHRISTOPHER PLACE (Working name)
- THE SPEECH LANGUAGE AND HEARING CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Jaye-Lipton | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Smollan-Kaplan | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam Charles Marks | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAYE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA HARDING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.85k | £149.19k | £204.26k | £81.61k | £186.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.49k | £275.21k | £202.09k | £106.75k | £177.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25TH JULY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON THE 7TH MARCH 1991 AND 24TH APRIL 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF IN NEED OF CHILDREN OF PRE-SCHOOL AGE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM DIFFICULTIES WITH HEARING OR SPEECH
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Hendon Hall Court
Parson Street
LONDON
NW4 1QY
- Phone:
- 07511 063 751
- Email:
- administrator@slhf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window