Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF STRATFORD UPON AVON TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1002465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £76.34k £18.41k £79.26k £24.74k £38.60k
Total expenditure £29.57k £37.00k £89.64k £37.38k £29.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A