MUKER EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational grants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 April 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam John Hunter | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RUKIN | Trustee | 29 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAURICE GUY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR K GUY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR T METCALFE | Trustee |
|
||||||
REVEREND CAROLINE HEWLETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.67k | £154.98k | £635.74k | £7.83k | £7.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.52k | £168.63k | £642.95k | £5.23k | £8.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £635.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £143 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £8.19k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £634.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £3.42k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7 DECEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SWALEDALE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SWALEDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MUKER EDUCATIONAL TRUST
21 GALGATE
BARNARD CASTLE
DL12 8EQ
- Phone:
- 01388603073
- Email:
- Office@mbmcgarry.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window