THE WARDE-ALDAM CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1002525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of village hall & community space at Clayton, Doncaster. Occasional small donations to other charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,925
Total expenditure: £60

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Doncaster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 April 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Isabel Annie Warde-Aldam Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Constance Amelia Warde-Aldam Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
CHARLES ANDREW WARDE-ALDAM Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.48k £1.35k £1.29k £1.38k £1.93k
Total expenditure £574 £1.10k £1.02k £60 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 February 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2022 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WRIGLEYS SOLICITORS LLP
3rd FLOOR, 3 WELLINGTON PLACE
LEEDS
LS1 4AP
Phone:
01132446100
Website:

No information available