Financial history THE DOMUS COMMUNITIES

Charity number: 1002543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/04/2020 16/04/2021 16/04/2022 16/04/2023 16/04/2024
Total gross income £5.71k £5.64k £5.52k £5.32k £8.75k
Total expenditure £4.60k £5.21k £5.19k £4.99k £7.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A