Trustees CRANBROOK SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1002558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Smith-Bromage Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Cara Jane Hughes Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Laetitia Rose Hagan Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Sophie Eugenie Laurimore Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Katherine Anne Coltart Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Rachel Lane Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Lucinda Jane Howells Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
Susan Anne Jugnarain Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
Kristin A Watt-Bonar Trustee 11 March 2020
None on record
Lorraine Denise Cannell Trustee 28 April 2018
None on record
Georgina Stephenson Trustee 27 September 2017
None on record