KNOW YOUR BIBLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Northamptonshire
- Plymouth City
- Surrey
- Albania
- Armenia
- Australia
- Bulgaria
- Denmark
- Fiji
- New Zealand
- Russia
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 April 1991: Standard registration
- C W C I (Working name)
- CWCI (Working name)
- CHRISTIAN WOMEN COMMUNICATING INTL IN UK (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Chapple | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Brian Chapple | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Hoyles | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Gilbert | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Milligan | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tina Stevens | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Toy | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth White | Trustee | 10 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tim Gilbert | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.38k | £38.39k | £7.72k | £12.96k | £23.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.59k | £17.63k | £7.68k | £16.31k | £24.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Farley Copse
BRACKNELL
Berkshire
RG42 1PF
- Phone:
- 07784254408
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window