THE FOLLY FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to protect, preserve and promote for the benefit of the public the historical, architectural and constructional heritage existing in and around follies, grottoes and garden buildings. We publish "Follies Journal" annually, and "Follies" magazine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 April 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lewis Robert Gwyn Headley | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patrick David George Todd | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
IAIN KEBEL STANWAY GRAY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARY THERESE BRIGHT | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELIZABETH ANNE WATERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.27k | £16.79k | £115.91k | £17.14k | £155.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.98k | £21.18k | £10.47k | £18.34k | £18.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 February 2024 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 05 February 2024 | 676 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 11 AUGUST 2001 AND 14 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT, PRESERVE AND PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE EXISTING IN AND AROUND FOLLIES, GROTTOES, AND GARDEN BUILDINGS, MONUMENTS, RUINS, SITES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR OTHERWISE OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Keble House
Manor Fields
London
SW15 3LS
- Phone:
- 02088704567
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window