WAR WIDOWS ASSOCIATION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve conditions for War Widows and Widowers and to keep them informed of legislation that may affect them. To keep the government informed of their needs and circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 April 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Dziuba | Chair | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeannette Strachan | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MARK GARDINER STEELE | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Bowles | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col Retd David Whimpenny | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Eileen Kelly-McGregor | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Carter | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE WILLIAM WHITTLES | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Raw | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.75k | £170.33k | £64.14k | £81.36k | £95.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.35k | £185.20k | £159.99k | £133.46k | £153.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 10/04/1991 AS AMENDED ON 26/03/1997 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2000 AS AMENDED ON 30/03/2004 AS AMENDED ON 05/04/2005 AS AMENDED ON 29/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 31/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 06/04/2013 as amended on 22 Mar 2022 as amended on 22 Mar 2022 as amended on 16 Jun 2022 as amended on 23 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
To improve the conditions of war widows and war widowers and their dependents of those who served in the United Kingdom Armed Forces and who may be encountering difficulties.”
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o 199 Borough High St
London
SE1 1AA
- Phone:
- 08452412189
- Email:
- info@warwidows.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window