THE GATESHEAD JEWISH FAMILY SERVICE

Charity number: 1002688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Gateshead Jewish Family Service provides an ethnically sensitive social services facility to members of the jewish community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £20,218
Total expenditure: £8,940

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
joseph hirsch Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
RABBI DAVID JACOB BOWDEN Trustee
KHG
Received: On time
LEE ROBERTS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.53k £2.20k £12.44k £3.67k £20.22k
Total expenditure £12.68k £4.11k £9.81k £4.64k £8.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 OXFORD TERRACE
GATESHEAD
NE8 1RQ
Phone:
01914775677
Website:

No information available