PEARCE ROOD CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was set up by Mr P E Rood to provide scholarships and prizes to law students at Rhodes University, South Africa. For the past few years the charity has been dormant as Mr Rood has provided the funds required for the scholarships etc through another English charity, Rhodes University Trust (UK).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- South Africa
Governance
- 30 April 1991: Standard registration
- 25 July 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2007 | 30/04/2008 | 30/04/2009 | 30/04/2010 | 30/04/2011 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | 15 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | 09 March 2011 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 FEBRUARY 1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT 1 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS FOR LAW STUDENTS AT RHODES UNIVERSITY GRAHAMSTOWN SOUTH AFRICA
Area of benefit
SOUTH AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window