WINTERBOURNE EARLY YEARS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
community pre-school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £223,332 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 07 May 1991: Standard registration
- ST MICHAELS AT GREENFIELD PRE-SCHOOL GROUP (Working name)
- ST MICHAEL'S PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Godfrey | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Harris | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erin Hackett Jeffries | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bonnie Kembrey | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Wainwright | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Matthews | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA CONWAY | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.44k | £162.42k | £195.47k | £255.14k | £273.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.70k | £128.86k | £182.51k | £238.58k | £261.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £40.00k | £3.48k | £216.02k | £223.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 2 AUGUST 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART. (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN. (C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Greenfield Centre
Greenfields Centre
Park Avenue
Winterbourne
BRISTOL
BS36 1NJ
- Phone:
- 01454773781
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window