THE CLAIRE HUNTER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
small annual donations are made to broadly the same charities each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 May 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair Hunter Gunn | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY GUNN | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS RUPERT WILLAN JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.26k | £14.31k | £16.14k | £11.73k | £21.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.56k | £13.39k | £20.59k | £5.11k | £12.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH FEBRUARY 1991
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATION OR ORGANISATIONS OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS BETWEEN THEM IF MORE THAN ONE AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DOVECOTE HOUSE
MAIN STREET
EPPERSTONE
NOTTINGHAM
NG14 6AU
- Phone:
- 01159665874
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window