FRIENDS OF GREENWAY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends Of Greenway School (FOGS) comprises a group of parents and staff who meet together to organise fundraising events and social occasions for staff and parents to get to know one another on a more informal footing. Monies from fundraising events are used to provide additional resources and first hand experiences for our children to enhance their access to the curriculum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Cardiff
Governance
- 08 May 1991: Standard registration
- F O G S (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR NIC NAISH | Chair | 14 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Lavington | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA RITA CAMILLERI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE ANN PYM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MIKE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS MEL JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JAN THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON CROTHERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.27k | £1.73k | £183 | £1.45k | £3.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.81k | £1.82k | £593 | £906 | £1.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 July 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2021 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREENWAY PRIMARY SCHOOL
LLANSTEPHAN ROAD
RUMNEY
CARDIFF
CF3 3JG
- Phone:
- 02920777048
- Email:
- nic.naish@cardiff.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window