Governing document THE KING'S CHURCH (HORSHAM)
Charity number: 1002821
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1990, AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 22ND APRIL 1991, 29TH OCTOBER 1993, 19TH MARCH 1994 AND SCHEME OF 18TH NOVEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND PURSUE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.