Financial history THE JOHN BUCKLEY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1002824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.15k £2.57k £5.41k £5.98k £6.75k
Total expenditure £4.34k £2.17k £4.43k £6.48k £5.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A